Global Patent Index - EP 0997318 A3

EP 0997318 A3 2001-01-03 - Roller wash

Title (en)

Roller wash

Title (de)

Walzenwaschmittel

Title (fr)

Produit de lavage des rouleaux

Publication

EP 0997318 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119728 A

Priority

DE 19847171 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19945221A1] Composition for cleaning the cylinders, polymer plates and other contaminated parts of printing machines comprises 5-80 wt.% of a di- or polyhydric alcohol or glycol ether, 0.05-5 wt.% surfactant, 0.5-10 wt.% water-miscible organic solvent(s), 0.1-4 wt.% pH regulator, 0-0.005 wt.% biocide and 0-80 wt.% water. An Independent claim is also included for use of the composition as a filling medium in ultrasonic baths.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/44 (2006.01); C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/43 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01); C11D 10/02 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 3/2041 (2013.01); C11D 3/2065 (2013.01); C11D 3/2068 (2013.01); C11D 3/43 (2013.01); C11D 11/0041 (2013.01); C11D 11/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19945221 A1 20000420; CN 1250805 A 20000419; EP 0997318 A2 20000503; EP 0997318 A3 20010103; JP 2000204396 A 20000725; KR 20000029038 A 20000525; TW 537976 B 20030621; US 6265365 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI