Global Patent Index - EP 0997322 A1

EP 0997322 A1 2000-05-03 - Rubberized fabric and tire with zero-degree reinforcing elements

Title (en)

Rubberized fabric and tire with zero-degree reinforcing elements

Title (de)

Gummierte Verstärkungslage und Reifen mit Nul-Grad-orientierten Verstärkungselementen

Title (fr)

Armature de caoutchoutée et bandage pneumatique à renforts orientés à zéro degré

Publication

EP 0997322 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98120356 A

Priority

EP 98120356 A

Abstract (en)

A rubberized fabric for a tire belt incorporating continuous reinforcing elements made from a shape-memory material and a tire incorporating same. The rubberized fabric forms the zero-degree belt layer of the tire. The fundamental characteristic of the fabric resides in its incorporation of means to stabilize the reinforcing elements in the predetermined position within the fabric. Stabilization of the reinforcing elements is accomplished by shaping the reinforcing elements in the form of side-by-side metal straps (15). The minimum width (L) of each metal strap (15) is about 1 mm and the thickness (S) of the rubberized fabric incorporating the metal straps has a maximum value of about 0.4 mm and is preferably about 0.3 mm. Among other things, the rubberized fabric improves the vulcanization process of the tire by constraining the underlying belt layers, lessens the consequences of "flatspotting", and permits the construction of a lighter weight tire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 9/22; B60C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/06 (2006.01); B60C 9/00 (2006.01); B60C 9/20 (2006.01); B60C 9/22 (2006.01); C22C 14/00 (2006.01); C22C 19/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/2204 (2013.01); B60C 9/0007 (2013.01); B60C 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997322 A1 20000503; EP 0997322 B1 20030709; AT 244650 T 20030715; BR 9904706 A 20000815; CN 1252362 A 20000510; DE 69816302 D1 20030814; DE 69816302 T2 20040603; ES 2202715 T3 20040401; JP 2000313205 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091029

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081018

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202715 T3

2003-12-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-10-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-10-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816302 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU PT SE

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU PT SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI