Global Patent Index - EP 0997365 A1

EP 0997365 A1 2000-05-03 - Blocking device for sliding side panels or covers of wagons

Title (en)

Blocking device for sliding side panels or covers of wagons

Title (de)

Feststelleinrichtung für Schiebewände oder Haubenverdecke von Güterwagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage pour parois coulissantes ou pour capots de wagons

Publication

EP 0997365 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250381 A

Priority

DE 19850805 A

Abstract (en)

A locking pin(9) pointing in the wagon's transverse direction is attached to the running gear(8) of the wagon's sliding side(4), and a run-on lever(10) with a guide nose(12) is attached by a pivot(16') to a locking pawl(11) which is provided with a recess(14). The locking pawl together with the run-on lever is attached by a further pivot(16) to the body of the wagon, and the pivoting ranges of the lever and pawl are limited by stops(13,13').

Abstract (de)

Feststelleinrichtung für Schiebewände oder Haubenverdecke von Güterwagen, die die Schiebewand sicher am Untergestell fixiert, tragende Bauteile der Schiebewand nicht schwächt, aus wenigen Bauteilen besteht, größere Toleranzen vermeidet und eine langfristige Funktionssicherheit gewährleistet. An einem Laufwerk (8) einer Schiebewand (4) ist ein in Wagenquerrichtung weisender Arretierungsbolzen (9) angeordnet. Ein Anlaufhebel (10) mit einer Führungsnase (12) ist über ein Drehgelenk (16') schwenkbar an einer mit einer Ausnehmung (14) gestalteten Sperrklinke (11) befestigt. Die Sperrklinke (11) ist zusammen mit dem an der Sperrklinke (11) beweglich angeordneten Anlaufhebel (10) über ein Drehgelenk (16) schwenkbar am Wagenkasten befestigt und die Schwenkbereiche des Anlaufhebels (1) und der Sperrklinke (11) sind durch Anschläge (13, 13') begrenzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/00 (2006.01); B61D 17/08 (2006.01); B61D 17/12 (2006.01); B61D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997365 A1 20000503; EP 0997365 B1 20040225; AT 260194 T 20040315; CZ 292111 B6 20030716; CZ 9903775 A3 20000517; DE 19850805 A1 20000511; DE 19850805 B4 20070913; HU 222967 B1 20040128; HU 9903938 A2 20020828; HU 9903938 D0 20000128; PL 193690 B1 20070330; PL 336288 A1 20000508; SK 147299 A3 20000516; SK 285042 B6 20060504

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071019

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071019

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FI FR GB IT SE

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT FI FR GB IT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT FI FR GB IT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI