Global Patent Index - EP 0997375 A2

EP 0997375 A2 2000-05-03 - Oar stop

Title (en)

Oar stop

Title (de)

Anschlag für Ruder

Title (fr)

Butée pour aviron

Publication

EP 0997375 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307665 A

Priority

GB 9823698 A

Abstract (en)

A rowing oar or scull button assembly (10) comprising a clamp consisting of first (12) and second (14) clamp parts which in use substantially encircle an oar or scull shaft and two securing means, (32,34) each securing means securing adjacent ends of the first and second clamp parts, in which at least one securing means includes a screw-threaded member (36,37) rotatable about a first axis (A1), and a lever (38,39) pivotally connected about a second axis (A2) to the threaded member and selectively movable from a first position to at least a second position relative to the threaded member, a threaded portion of the member engaging a co-operating threaded portion of the second clamp part and a camming surface (44A,46A) of the lever acting to clamp the corresponding adjacent ends of the first and second clamp parts, rotation of the lever in the first position about the first axis causing tightening of the securing means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 16/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 16/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 16/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2002707 A 19790228 - NANKIVELL D, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997375 A2 20000503; EP 0997375 A3 20020206; GB 2343167 A 20000503; GB 9823698 D0 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI