Global Patent Index - EP 0997378 A1

EP 0997378 A1 2000-05-03 - Magazine for folding boxes in a packaging machine

Title (en)

Magazine for folding boxes in a packaging machine

Title (de)

Faltschachtel-Magazin in einer Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Magasin de boîtes pliantes dans une machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 0997378 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119883 A

Priority

DE 19849406 A

Abstract (en)

The folding box magazine's feed belt(26) on its forward end close to the magazine chute(31) is mounted on the latter by a first bearing(21), and close to its lower end is mounted on a second bearing(28) of a pendulum support(29) so as to be horizontally and vertically displaceable. The second bearing of the pendulum support is a pivot, and the pendulum support on its other end pivots on a fixed point. The two bearings of the pendulum support are displaceable in relation to each other in the direction of the magazine chute.

Abstract (de)

Ein Faltschachtel-Magazin in einer Verpackungsmaschine umfaßt einen die zusammengelegten Faltschachteln in Form eines Stapels aufnehmenden Magazinschacht (31), eine Übergabevorrichtung (13), die einen Greifer (14) aufweist, mittels dessen die untere Faltschachtel des Stapels aus dem Magazinschacht (31) entnehmbar ist, und ein Zuführband (26), mittels dessen die Faltschachteln in den Magazinschacht einbringbar sind. Eine erste Verstellvorrichtung (15,16,17) dient zur Höhenverstellung des Greifers und des Magazinschachtes (31) relativ zu einem weiterführenden Transportband (32) und eine zweite Verstellvorrichtung (18,19) ist für die Ausrichtung des Magazinschachtes relativ zum Greifer (14) vorgesehen, wobei das Zuführband (26) in seiner Höhenlage und/oder seiner Neigung veränderbar ist. Eine einfache Verstellung des Zuführbandes ist dadurch gegeben, daß das Zuführband (26) an seinem vorderen Ende nahe dem Magazinschacht (31) an diesem über ein erstes Lager (21) gelenkig gelagert und nahe seinem hinteren Ende in einem zweiten Lager (28) einer Steurkurve folgend verlagerbar ist. Dabei kann die Steuerkurve von einer Pendelstütze (29) definiert sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/14 (2006.01); B65B 43/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997378 A1 20000503; EP 0997378 B1 20030115; AT 231086 T 20030215; DE 19849406 A1 20000504; DK 0997378 T3 20030505; ES 2188082 T3 20030616; JP 2000128126 A 20000509; US 6276893 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IWK VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051031

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051008

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-08-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051007

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-10-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-10-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-10-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-10-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2004-10-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-10-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-10-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188082 T3

2003-05-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-04-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904032 P 20030220

2003-02-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2001-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI