Global Patent Index - EP 0997380 A1

EP 0997380 A1 2000-05-03 - Easy-open collapsible cardboard box

Title (en)

Easy-open collapsible cardboard box

Title (de)

Leicht zu öffnender Faltkarton

Title (fr)

Caisse en carton à ouverture et remise à plat facile

Publication

EP 0997380 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402669 A

Priority

FR 9813557 A

Abstract (en)

The crate comprises four side walls (2,3), two opposite ones having first closing flaps and the other two opposite walls having second closing flaps (12,13). The second abutting flaps cover the first flaps and adhesive tearable bands (32) are positioned on their joints to ensure closing of the packaging. The side walls carrying the first flaps have perforation lines (24). These flaps also have an opening formed by a cutting line.

Abstract (fr)

L'emballage en forme de caisse conforme à l'invention est constitué d'une ceinture de quatre parois latérales (1, 2, 3, 4), deux desdites parois (2, 4) en opposition étant munies de premiers rabats de fermeture (17, 18) et les deux autres parois latérales (1, 3) étant munies de seconds rabats de fermeture (12, 13). Ces seconds rabats (12, 13) viennent en recouvrement sur lesdits premiers rabats (17, 18) ; ils sont jointifs ou pratiquement jointifs et des bandes adhésives arrachables (32) sont positionnées sur leur zone de jointure pour assurer la fermeture de l'emballage. Conformément à l'invention, l'une des parois latérales (2) qui porte les premiers rabats de fermeture (17) comporte un moyen d'ouverture en forme de structure arrachable (24) disposé sur toute sa longueur ou largeur selon le cas, entre lesdits premiers rabats (17) ; d'autre part, les rabats (17) associés à cette paroi (2) comportent, sur toute leur hauteur, un moyen d'ouverture situé dans le prolongement de ladite structure d'arrachage (24), constitué d'une ligne de coupe (28), d'une découpe et/ou d'un élément de prolongation de ladite structure d'arrachage. Ces particularités permettent d'assurer l'ouverture et la remise à plat automatique de la caisse après enlèvement de la structure arrachable (24) et des bandes adhésives (32). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/542 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997380 A1 20000503; FR 2784964 A1 20000428; FR 2784964 B1 20010119

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021003

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020523

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI