Global Patent Index - EP 0997385 A2

EP 0997385 A2 2000-05-03 - Container and lid with opening device

Title (en)

Container and lid with opening device

Title (de)

Öffnungshilfe an einem mit Deckel verschlossenen Behälter

Title (fr)

Récipient et couvercle avec moyen d'ouverture

Publication

EP 0997385 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121563 A

Priority

DE 19850138 A

Abstract (en)

The container has a lid seat(21) is installed on the body(20w) into which an edge section(11) of the lid(D) at least partially fits so as to seal the body. A flexible but extension resistant material strip(30) extends through the seal formed by the lid edge and lid seat and is fixed on the inner side of the lid pointing in towards the body by adhesive forces and protrudes outside the seal. An Independent claim is included for a procedure for fitting an opening aid in the form of a material strip on a container body closed by a press-in lid.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Behälter mit einem leicht zu öffnenden (abnehmbaren) Verschlußdeckel (D) vorgesehen, der durch klemmende Wirkung (11,12,21) in einem oberen Rumpfende eingefügt gehalten wird. Am Rumpf (20w,B) ist ein obenliegender Deckelsitz, als Bordierung (21) angeordnet, in den ein Randbereich (11) des Deckels (D) eingreift, um den Deckel (D) auf dem Rumpf (B) zu halten. Um den Behälter leichter öffnen zu können, verläuft durch den Verschluß aus Deckelrand (11) und Deckelsitz (21) am Rumpf ein flexibler aber zugfester Materialstreifen (30;30a, 30b,30f,30e), der auf der Innenseite des Deckels (D) durch Klebe-Adhäsionskräfte (31,31') fixiert ist und außerhalb des Verschlusses hervorsteht. Ein Verfahren zum Anbringen einer Öffnungshilfe (30; 30b,30f,30e) wird ergänzend vorgeschlagen. Es hat sich dabei überraschend herausgestellt, daß der dünne Streifen sich ausgezeichnet durch den Deckelsitz hindurchlegen läßt, ohne die Halte- oder Dichtungseigenschaften des verschlossenen Gebindes aus Deckel und Behälter im Bereich des Deckelsitzes zu verschlechtern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/34 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00638 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00731 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997385 A2 20000503; EP 0997385 A3 20030618; DE 19850138 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-16 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: IMPRESS GMBH & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI