Global patent index - EP 0997388 A3

EP 0997388 A3 2000-12-27 - Package sleeve

Title (en)

Package sleeve

Title (de)

Packungshülse

Title (fr)

Emballage à manchon

Publication

EP 0997388 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99120610 A

Priority

GB 9822609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997388A2] A package (2) for holding at least two articles (4, 6) in mutual location by a sleeve (12) formed of board material. The sleeve (12) has location means (14, 15) for each of the articles (4, 6) to allow for the retention of a portion of the articles (4, 6) in the location means (14, 15) to form the package (2). The sleeve (12) can preferably be formed of corrugated board material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/46 (2006.01); B65D 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/46 (2013.01); B65D 73/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997388 A2 20000503; EP 0997388 A3 20001227; GB 9822609 D0 19981209

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040501

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI