Global Patent Index - EP 0997396 A1

EP 0997396 A1 2000-05-03 - Cap for two-components aerosol container

Title (en)

Cap for two-components aerosol container

Title (de)

Schutzkappe für eine Zweikomponenten-Sprühdose

Title (fr)

Capuchon pour récipient aérosol à deux composants

Publication

EP 0997396 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118443 A

Priority

DE 29819174 U

Abstract (en)

The protective cap has an edge (3) which can fit firmly but removably on a bulge (4) of the can (1) surrounding the spray valve. Inside it, there is a receiving cavity (7) for a smaller aerosol can (8) containing the setting components. The receiving cavity may be formed from a guide for the smaller aerosol can, the axis of which coincides with that of the main can. This guide may be formed from guide ribs (9) on the inside of the cap wall which grip the small aerosol can..

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Schutzkappe für eine Aerosoldose beschrieben, die Teil einer Zweikomponenten-Lacksprühdose ist und in ihrem Inneren einen Aufnahmeraum (7) für eine kleinere, die Härtekomponente enthaltende Aerosoldose aufweist, der bis zur oberen Abschlußwand (2b) der Schutzkappe (2) reicht. In dem an die kleinere Aerosoldose angrenzenden Bereich der Abschlußwand (2b) ist ein Auslöseteil (13) vorgesehen, der unter Kraftwirkung nach innen und gegen die kleinere Aerosoldose drückbar ist, die dadurch axial so weit aus ihrem Aufnahmeraum herausdrückbar ist, daß der Umfüllvorgang der unter höherem Druck stehenden Härterkomponente in die Zweikomponenten-Lacksprühdose möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/40 (2013.01); B65D 83/425 (2013.01); B65D 83/687 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819174 U1 19990128; EP 0997396 A1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030916

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000623;LT PAYMENT 20000623;LV PAYMENT 20000623;MK PAYMENT 20000623;RO PAYMENT 20000623;SI PAYMENT 20000623

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI