Global Patent Index - EP 0997397 A1

EP 0997397 A1 2000-05-03 - System and method for fixing a dispensing device onto a container neck and dispenser using said fixing system

Title (en)

System and method for fixing a dispensing device onto a container neck and dispenser using said fixing system

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zur Befestigung eines Spenders auf einem Behälterstutzen sowie Spender welcher besagtes Befestigungsystem verwendet

Title (fr)

Organe et procédé de fixation d'un dispositif de distribution sur le col d'un réservoir et distributeur utilisant un tel organe de fixation

Publication

EP 0997397 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402499 A

Priority

FR 9813107 A

Abstract (en)

The fixture (1,2) is used to attach a dispenser (4) onto the neck of a container. It uses a ring (1) that is made of plastic material and the ring carries location fittings (12,13) that are used to attach it onto the neck of the container. A metallic coupling (2) is located inside the ring this provides the retainer (22,23) for the dispenser.

Abstract (fr)

Organe de fixation (1, 2) d'un dispositif de distribution (4) sur le col d'un réservoir, caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend une bague (1) en matière plastique pourvue de moyens de fixation (12, 13) sur le col du réservoir et une coupelle métallique (2) reçue dans la bague et pourvue de moyens de maintien (22, 23) du dispositif de distribution (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3049 (2013.01); B65D 83/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2784660 A1 20000421; FR 2784660 B1 20001229; EP 0997397 A1 20000503; US 6273303 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1027791

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020401

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DE POUS, OLIVIER

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CAMPFORT, CHRISTIAN

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI