Global Patent Index - EP 0997414 A1

EP 0997414 A1 2000-05-03 - Winding machine

Title (en)

Winding machine

Title (de)

Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Enrouleuse

Publication

EP 0997414 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114449 A

Priority

DE 19848815 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has reel-spools and associated winding rollers, and a winding gap between them to influence the winding hardness, whereby at least one roller is enclosed by a tensioned continuous belt having an outer soft rubber layer with integrated hollow chambers. The machine has reel-spools (16) and associated winding rollers (18), and a winding gap (20) between them to influence the winding hardness. At least one roller is enclosed by a tensioned continuous belt (22). The belt is soft and/or flexible, extends mainly across the whole machine width, and has adjustable tension. It has an outer soft rubber layer with integrated hollow chambers. A tension unit (24) of adjustable tension roller is positioned inside the belt. The winding roller has a metallic jacket.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wickelmaschine 10 zur Erzeugung wenigstens eines Wickels 12 aus einer zugeführten Materialbahn 14 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn werden die Materialbahn 14 oder aus dieser erzeugte Teilbahnen jeweils auf einen insbesondere durch eine Hülse oder dergleichen gebildeten Kern 16 aufgewickelt, wobei zwischen einem jeweiligen Kern 16 bzw. dem darauf entstehenden Wickel 12 und wenigstens einer zugeordneten Wickelwalze 18 zumindest ein die Wickelhärte beeinflussender Wickelspalt 20 gebildet wird. Wenigstens eine Wickelwalze 18 ist von einem vorgespannten endlosen Band 22 umschlungen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41485 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41486 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414866 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848815 A1 20000427; EP 0997414 A1 20000503; US 6332589 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040414

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021016

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI