Global Patent Index - EP 0997415 A1

EP 0997415 A1 2000-05-03 - Winding machine

Title (en)

Winding machine

Title (de)

Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Enrouleuse

Publication

EP 0997415 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114451 A

Priority

DE 19848813 A

Abstract (en)

A paper length (14) is passed over a support drum (12), and there is a winding gap (18) between the drum and the reel-spool (16). The support drum has a perforated jacket and/or circumferential grooves, and is supplied with suction force via an external suction box (42). The box has a suction aperture (44) opposite the part of the support drum not covered by the paper length and a sealing element (46,48) around the aperture, which acts with the drum. The seal also acts as a scraper, to remove the front end of the paper length from the support drum.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wickelmaschine 10 zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn 14 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn auf einen Tambour 16 wird die Materialbahn 14 über eine besaugbare Tragtrommel 12 geführt und zwischen der Tragtrommel 12 und dem Tambour ein Wickelspalt 18 gebildet. Die einen gelochten Mantel aufweisende und/oder mit Umfangsrillen versehene Tragtrommel 16 ist über wenigstens einen äußeren Saugkasten 42 besaugbar, der mit wenigstens einer Saugöffnung 44 dem nicht von der Materialbahn 14 umschlungenen Umfangsbereich der Tragtrommel 12 gegenüberliegt und im Bereich dieser Saugöffnung 44 wenigstens ein mit der Tragtrommel 12 zusammenwirkendes Dichtelement 46, 48 aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/28 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41414 (2013.01); B65H 2301/522 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848813 A1 20000427; AT 258892 T 20040215; EP 0997415 A1 20000503; EP 0997415 B1 20040204; US 6325320 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100724

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100723

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100723

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908452

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908452 P 20040311

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI