Global Patent Index - EP 0997416 A1

EP 0997416 A1 2000-05-03 - Method for leading a web onto a roller and device to execute the method

Title (en)

Method for leading a web onto a roller and device to execute the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufführen einer Materialbahn auf einen Tambour und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour guider une bande de matériau sur un tambour et dispositif pour la réalisation de cette méthode

Publication

EP 0997416 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114489 A

Priority

DE 19848806 A

Abstract (en)

Front end of paper length (4) is passed over a drum (3) in front of the reel-spool (5,7). Before being placed on the reel-spool, the front end is kept separate of it by blown air. The air is applied against the movement direction (VII) of the paper, to the empty reel-spool (7) on the drum and/or the reel-spool (5) pressed against the drum, downstream of the contact line (A) between drum and spool. The blown air supply is switched-on automatically, and is applied at a distance to the reel-spool, which is adjusted dependent upon a distance sensor (11).

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Aufführen einer Materialbahn (4) auf einen Tambour (5, 7), insbesondere in einer Papierherstellungsmaschine, bei welchem der Anfang der aufzuführenden Materialbahn (4) um eine dem Tambour (5, 7) vorgeschaltete Trommel (3) herumgeführt und vor dem Aufführen auf den Tambour (5, 7) einer Vorbereitungsstation wie beispielsweise einem Ausschußauflöser zugeführt wird, wobei zur Verhinderung eines Selbstaufführens der Materialbahn (4) auf den Tambour (5, 7) die Materialbahn (4) vor dem Aufführen auf den Tambour (5, 7) mittels Blasluft vom Tambour (5, 7) ferngehalten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41414 (2013.01); B65H 2301/52 (2013.01); B65H 2301/522 (2013.01); B65H 2406/11 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848806 A1 20000427; AT 260215 T 20040315; EP 0997416 A1 20000503; EP 0997416 B1 20040225; US 6332587 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-05-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908630

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 260215 T

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908630

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120724

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-06-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908630 P 20040401

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI