Global Patent Index - EP 0997417 A1

EP 0997417 A1 2000-05-03 - Method and device for severing a running web

Title (en)

Method and device for severing a running web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Durchtrennen einer laufenden Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour couper une bande en déplacement

Publication

EP 0997417 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114472 A

Priority

DE 19848810 A

Abstract (en)

Cutting a continuous moving material sheet involves using a cutting unit which is movable relative to the material sheet in a plane substantially parallel to the material sheet. The moving material sheet (10) is cut through completely by means of at least one cutter unit which moves relative to the material sheet in a plane substantially parallel to the material sheet. An independent claim is also included for an apparatus for implementation of the above method, in which the cutter unit of the apparatus is movable relative to the material sheet in a plane substantially parallel to the material sheet.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Durchtrennen einer laufenden Materialbahn (10), insbesondere einer Papierbahn, bei dem die Materialbahn nacheinander auf mehrere Wickelkerne (12, 14), insbesondere Tamboure, aufgewickelt und jeweils mit dem Aufwickeln auf einen neuen Wickelkern (12) begonnen wird, wenn eine auf einem vorherigen alten Wickelkern (14) gebildete Wickelrolle (16) einen vorbestimmten Durchmesser erreicht hat, wobei der neue Wickelkern (12) zwischen eine Wickelwalze (18), insbesondere eine Tragwalze, und den alten Wickelkern (14), dem die Materi-albahn (10) über die Wickelwalze (18) zugeführt wird, gebracht und die laufende Materialbahn (10) in dem Bereich zwischen einem Spalt (20), der von der Wickelwalze (18) und dem neuen Wickelkern (12) gebildet wird, und der auf dem alten Wickelkern (14) gebildeten Wickelrolle (16) durchtrennt wird, und wobei die Materialbahn (10) mittels wenigstens einer Schneidvorrichtung, die in einer zur Materialbahn (10) etwa parallelen Ebene relativ zur Materialbahn (10) bewegt wird, vollständig durchtrennt wird. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/04 (2006.01); B26D 1/10 (2006.01); B26D 1/11 (2006.01); B26D 5/04 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B26D 1/045 (2013.01); B26D 1/105 (2013.01); B26D 1/115 (2013.01); B26D 5/04 (2013.01); B65H 19/265 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41898 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51534 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51536 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2364 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848810 A1 20000427; AT 252045 T 20031115; EP 0997417 A1 20000503; EP 0997417 B1 20031015

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160723

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160723

2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 252045 T

- Effective date: 20160723

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907360

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907360 P 20031120

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-06-28 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI