Global Patent Index - EP 0997418 A1

EP 0997418 A1 2000-05-03 - Method and device for severing a running web

Title (en)

Method and device for severing a running web

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Durchtrennen einer laufenden Materialbahn und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour couper une bande en déplacement

Publication

EP 0997418 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114488 A

Priority

DE 19848808 A

Abstract (en)

In a cutter device the cutting prints are located along a line, which is at an angle to the direction of movement of the paper. The new front paper end created by the cutting process is moved towards the empty reel-spool by blown air. A cutter device (6) is moved into the path of the paper between a winding roller (1) and an empty reel-spool on one side, and a reel-spool (2a) with a paper coil (2). The paper length (4) is cut several times across its width by the cutter, so that the cutting prints are located along a line, which is at an angle to the direction of movement (III) of the paper. The new front paper end created by the cutting process is moved towards the empty reel-spool (5) by blown air. The cutter device consists of a driven rotating cutter roller, which moves between rest and cutting positions, and has several cutter elements (10) positioned on its jacket along one or more spiral lines. The rotary speed of the roller is almost synchronized with that of the paper.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Durchtrennen einer laufenden Materialbahn (4), insbesondere einer Papierbahn in einer Aufwickelvorrichtung beim Tambourwechsel, bei welchem eine Trennvorrichtung (6, 23, 24), insbesondere zwischen einer Wickelwalze (1) und einem Leertambour (5) einerseits und einem einen auf der Vorrichtung gebildeten Wickel (2) tragenden Tambour (2a) andererseits, in den Bahnlaufweg bewegt wird, wobei zur Erzeugung einer gewünschten Form der Trennkante die Materialbahn (4) durch die Trennvorrichtung (6, 23, 24) über die Breite der Materialbahn (4) nacheinander an mehreren Stellen durchtrennt wird, so daß die Trennstellen bezogen auf die Materialbahn (4) längs einer zur Bahnlaufrichtung (III) geneigt verlaufenden Linie liegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/10 (2006.01); B26F 3/00 (2006.01); B26F 3/02 (2006.01); B65H 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2013.01); B26D 3/10 (2013.01); B26F 3/002 (2013.01); B26F 3/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848808 A1 20000427; AT 260216 T 20040315; EP 0997418 A1 20000503; EP 0997418 B1 20040225; US 6464161 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080724

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070713

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-06-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908631

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI