Global Patent Index - EP 0997421 A1

EP 0997421 A1 2000-05-03 - Apparatus for gathering printed products

Title (en)

Apparatus for gathering printed products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Sammeln von Druckprodukten

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage de produits imprimés

Publication

EP 0997421 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811074 A

Priority

EP 98811074 A

Abstract (en)

The printed product collation device has an endless collection chain (1) to which the printed products (8) are delivered, with operation of the product delivery. A collection chain, a stapler (12) and/or a trimmer (26) delivery is made via a master servo drive (19) for operation of the collection chain and a number of synchronized slave servo drives (22,35,36).

Abstract (de)

Um Vibrationen an der Sammelkette und damit optimale Voraussetzungen für eine Adressierung zu schaffen, weist die Antriebsvorrichtung wenigstens einen Servoantrieb (19) auf, der die Sammelkette (1) antreibt und diesem Servoantrieb ein weiterer Antrieb für weitere Organe folgt. Damit ist ein Lauf der Sammelkette (1) im wesentlichen ohne zusätzliche Massenkräfte möglich, wobei ein schwingungsfreier Gleichlauf der Sammelkette gewährleistet ist. Nach einer bevorzugten Weiterbildung sind auch die Anleger (33, 34) jeweils von einem eigenen Servoantrieb (35, 36) angetrieben, was insbesondere das Einrichten und Umstellen auf eine andere Kettenteilung vereinfacht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/02; B42C 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 1/00 (2006.01); B42C 1/12 (2006.01); B42C 19/00 (2006.01); B65H 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/02 (2013.01); B42C 1/12 (2013.01); B65H 2513/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997421 A1 20000503; EP 0997421 B1 20061213; DE 59813845 D1 20070125; JP 2000135875 A 20000516; JP 4467110 B2 20100526; US 7055814 B1 20060606

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070123

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813845 P 20070125

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI