Global Patent Index - EP 0997422 A1

EP 0997422 A1 2000-05-03 - Yarn guide device

Title (en)

Yarn guide device

Title (de)

Fadenführungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage d'un fil

Publication

EP 0997422 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120210 A

Priority

EP 98120210 A

Abstract (en)

The yarn guide system at a bobbin winder, to produce cross wound bobbins, has yarn guide wings (10,11) with separate drives. The drives are controlled so that the position of the yarn transfer points (A,B;A',B') can be adjusted according to the required movement stroke length (H,H'). The drives for the two yarn guide wings (10,11) are connected to a common control. The curve disk (12) is adjusted by a setting drive, which is linked to the control of the yarn guide wing drives. To shorten the movement stroke length (H,H'), the yarn guide wings (10,11) are decelerated during a working stroke, and accelerated during the idle stroke. The reduction and increase in the yarn guide wing speed is each during only a short phase, at the start and end of each working or idle stroke. During the remainder of the stroke movement, the yarn guide wings are powered according to the bobbin rotation. To produce a wound bobbin with angled end sides, the stroke length (H,H') is reduced continuously, with the required yarn wing guide (10,11) speeds stored in the control memory. The bobbin shaft has a separate drive, connected to the control for the yarn guide wing motors. The drive control sets the reciprocating movements of the yarn according to the bobbin rotation. The parameters for the different yarn windings are stored in the control memory as tables.

Abstract (de)

Die Fadenführungsvorrichtung zum Aufspulen von Fäden zu Kreuzspulen weist zwei gegenläufig rotierbare, übereinander angeordneten Fadenführerflügel (10, 11) und eine Bogenscheibe (12) auf. Die Fadenführerflügel (10, 11) treten aus der Kontur (21) der Bogenscheibe (12) hervor und tauchen wieder in diese ein, wobei an den Eintauchpunkten (A, B; A', B') der Fadenführerflügel (10, 11) jeweils die Übergabe des Fadens erfolgt. Die Fadenführerflügel (10, 11) sind einzeln angetrieben und ihre Antriebe (16, 17) sind so steuerbar, dass die Orte der Fadenübergabepunkte (A, B; A', B') in Abhängigkeit vom gewünschten Hub (H, H') einstellbar sind. Die Antriebe der beiden Fadenführerflügel (10, 11) sind über eine gemeinsame Steuerung verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 57/00 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2839 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997422 A1 20000503; EP 0997422 B1 20030326; DE 59807660 D1 20030430; KR 20000029294 A 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071026

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHARER SCHWEITER METTLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061026

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061026

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050916

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHARER SCHWEITER METTLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-03-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807660 P 20030430

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI