Global Patent Index - EP 0997427 A1

EP 0997427 A1 2000-05-03 - Tower slewing crane

Title (en)

Tower slewing crane

Title (de)

Unten drehender Turmdrehkran

Title (fr)

Grue à tour pivotante

Publication

EP 0997427 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121078 A

Priority

DE 29819058 U

Abstract (en)

The tower crane comprises a cantilever section (7) which is connected to an inner tower section (2), and can be moved from its transport position to an erect position. In the transport position, the lower tower section (1) is pivotally connected to the rotating support (5) and is positioned below the upper tower section with the cantilever section lying flat on top. The crane is brought into an erected position using a tension cable (11,16) which is connected to a fixed point (12) on the cantilever and passes down to the rotating support via a pivotal upper support (15) and several rollers (18,19). A cable surface (20) is connected to the tension cable (16,22) which is located in a region below a roller (21) located on the top of the outer tower section.

Abstract (de)

Ein unten drehender Turmdrehkran ist mit einem an einen austeleskopierbaren inneren Turmstück (2) angelenkten Ausleger (7) versehen, der aus seiner Transportstellung, in der das gelenkig mit der Drehbühne (5) verbundene untere Turmstück (1) mit dem in dieses einteleskopierten oberen Turmstück (2) auf diese abgelegt und der Ausleger (7) an den Turm (1,2) angeklappt ist, durch Aufrichten des Turms (1,2) dadurch in seine Betriebsstellung verbracht werden kann, daß ein Abspannseil (11,16) von einem Festpunkt (12) am Ausleger (13) über eine schwenkbare obere Stütze (15) und Umlenkrollen (18,19) jeweils an der Drehbühne (5) im Abstand vom Turm (1,2) und an dem oberen Ende des unteren Turmstücks (1) zu einem Festpunkt (23) am unteren Ende des austeleskopierbaren Turmstücks (2), der mit dem äußeren Turmstück (1) verriegelbar ist, verläuft. Um den Turmdrehkran nur mit eigenen Antriebsmitteln aufrichten zu können, ist mit dem Abspannseil (16,22) eine Seilflasche (20) verbunden, die sich bei einteleskopiertem inneren Turmstück (2) im Bereich unterhalb der Umlenkrolle (21) am oberen Ende des äußeren Turmstücks (1) befindet. Über die Seilrolle (21) der Seilflasche (20) verläuft ein Seil (25) von einer auf der Drehbühne (5) angeordneten Montagewinde (24) zu einem den Turm (1,2) aufrichtenden Flaschenzug (27), dessen Seil zwischen Rollen (28,29) eingeschert ist, die am unteren Ende des Turms (1,2) und an der Drehbühne (5) gelagert sind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/342 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819058 U1 20000316; AT 253012 T 20031115; EP 0997427 A1 20000503; EP 0997427 B1 20031029; ES 2210943 T3 20040701; PT 997427 E 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161101

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LIEBHERR-WERK BIBERACH GMBH

- Free text: LIEBHERR-WERK BIBERACH GMBH#HANS-LIEBHERR-STRASSE 45#88400 BIBERACH AN DER RISS (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LIEBHERR-WERK BIBERACH GMBH#HANS-LIEBHERR-STRASSE 45#88400 BIBERACH AN DER RISS (DE)

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210943 T3

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2004-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2004-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907531 P 20031204

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AVV. FRANCO PAGANI

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI