Global patent index - EP 0997429 A1

EP 0997429 A1 2000-05-03 - Monorail trolley hoist with limited height

Title (en)

Monorail trolley hoist with limited height

Title (de)

Hebezeug für Einschienenhängekatze mit niedriger Bauhöhe

Title (fr)

Palan pour chariot monorail à hauteur limitée

Publication

EP 0997429 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120593 A

Priority

DE 19849995 A

Abstract (en)

The chain winch (4) has a drive housing (32) provided with a mounting surface for supporting the drive motor (31) and a chain cog housing (35), provided with integral fixings (113,116) on the side provided with the chain exit opening, for securing the chain winch to the travelling crane (2). An Independent claim for a travelling crane with a chain winch is also included.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kettenzug (4) für ein Katzfahrwerk (2) weist ein Getriebe (32) auf, das mit einer Montagefläche versehen ist. An der Montagefläche sind der Antriebsmotor (31) und ein Kettennussgehäuse (35) angeflanscht. Das Kettennussgehäuse (35) besteht aus einem hochfesten Material und ist an derjenigen Seite, an der das Lasttrum der Kette austritt, mit Befestigungsmittein (113,116) versehen, die dazu dienen, den Kettenzug (4) mit dem Katzfahrwerk (2) zu verbinden. Dadurch beschränkt sich der Kraftfluss, wie er durch Querkräfte hervorgerufen wird, auf das Kettennussgehäuse (35) und die Bereiche zwischen dem Kettennussgehäuse (35) und der Ausgangswelle (66) des Getriebes (32). Die übrigen Gehäuseteile sind querkraftfrei. Infolge dieser Anbringung ist eine beträchtliche Gewichtsersparnis möglich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 3/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997429 A1 20000503; EP 0997429 B1 20030910; DE 19849995 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906934

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DIETRICH, VOLKER

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FINZEL, MANFRED

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRATSCHMANN, THOMAS

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI