Global Patent Index - EP 0997431 A1

EP 0997431 A1 2000-05-03 - Corkscrew with height-adjustable supporting plate for the bottle

Title (en)

Corkscrew with height-adjustable supporting plate for the bottle

Title (de)

Korkenzieher mit höhenverstellbarer Stützplatte fuer die Flasche

Title (fr)

Tire-bouchon avec plateau support de bouteille réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0997431 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121338 A

Priority

IT MI982326 A

Abstract (en)

A bottle uncorking apparatus comprises: an uncorking unit (2) having a holding mouth (3) for the upper end of a bottle (4) provided with a cork (4a) to be pulled out, a guide bar (8) to be fixedly positioned relative to the uncorking unit (2) and close thereto, a base (17) , a slider (14) supporting said base (17) and slidable on the guide bar (8) parallelly of a trajectory (18) passing through the base (14) and the holding mouth (3), translation means (19) supported by the guide bar (8) and adapted to translate the slider (14) towards the holding mouth (3), and operating members (20) to be manually actuated against the action of the translation means (19) in a manner adapted to position the base (17) along said trajectory (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/0452 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997431 A1 20000503; EP 0997431 B1 20020306; DE 69900964 D1 20020411; IT 1303278 B1 20001106; IT MI982326 A1 20000430; IT MI982326 D0 19981030

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031026

2003-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031026

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-12-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900964 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-03-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI