Global patent index - EP 0997468 A2

EP 0997468 A2 2000-05-03 - Process for neutralising or reducing chlorine content of alkoxy silanes or alkoxysilane-based compositions

Title (en)

Process for neutralising or reducing chlorine content of alkoxy silanes or alkoxysilane-based compositions

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Neutralisation und Minderung von Resthalogengehalten in Alkoxysilanen oder Alkoxysilan-basierenden Zusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour neutraliser ou diminuer le contenu de chlorure d'alkoxysilanes ou de compositions à base d'alkoxysilanes

Publication

EP 0997468 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118741 A

Priority

DE 19849196 A

Abstract (en)

A method for neutralization and reduction of the residual acid halide content in alkoxysilanes or alkoxysilane-based compositions involves treatment with metallic magnesium in presence of an alcohol, followed by removal of solid.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Neutralisation und Minderung des Resthalogengehaltes in Alkoxysilanen oder in Alkoxysilan-basierenden Zusammensetzungen, das dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß man ein Alkoxysilan, das einen Restgehalt an acidem Halogenid aufweist, oder eine entsprechende Alkoxysilan-basierende Zusammensetzung in Gegenwart eines Alkohols mit metallischem Magnesium behandelt und anschließend die vorliegenden Feststoffe abtrennt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 7/20; C07F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/04 (2006.01); C07F 7/18 (2006.01); C07F 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/1836 (2013.01); C07F 7/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19849196 A1 20000427; EP 0997468 A2 20000503; EP 0997468 A3 20020123; EP 0997468 B1 20040121; JP 2000128887 A 20000509; US 6177584 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110922

2012-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EVONIK *DEGUSSA G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-06 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ERR

- Free Format Text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 05/03 PAGES: 237 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE.

2005-01-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-01-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI