Global Patent Index - EP 0997519 A1

EP 0997519 A1 2000-05-03 - Refrigerating machine oil

Title (en)

Refrigerating machine oil

Title (de)

Kältemaschinenöl

Title (fr)

Huile pour machine réfrigérante

Publication

EP 0997519 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99850142 A

Priority

JP 27556098 A

Abstract (en)

The refrigerating machine oils comprise the specific types of oxygen-containing synthetic oil. The refrigerating oils have excellent lubricity, miscibility with a refrigerant and stability when used together with a refrigerant containing dimethyl ether.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 171/00; C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/38 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 171/008 (2013.01); C10M 105/38 (2013.01); C10M 107/24 (2013.01); C10M 107/34 (2013.01); C10M 129/10 (2013.01); C10M 129/18 (2013.01); C10M 137/04 (2013.01); C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/04 (2013.01); C10M 2207/042 (2013.01); C10M 2207/046 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/284 (2013.01); C10M 2207/285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10M 2209/04 (2013.01); C10M 2209/043 (2013.01); C10M 2209/06 (2013.01); C10M 2209/062 (2013.01); C10M 2209/103 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/105 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1055 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1095 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997519 A1 20000503; JP 2000104085 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI