Global Patent Index - EP 0997521 A1

EP 0997521 A1 2000-05-03 - Detergent compositions containing alkoxylated fatty acid alkyl esters

Title (en)

Detergent compositions containing alkoxylated fatty acid alkyl esters

Title (de)

Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel enthaltend alkoxylierte Fettsäurealkylester

Title (fr)

Compositions détergentes contenant des esters alkyliques d'acides gras alcoxylés

Publication

EP 0997521 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120730 A

Priority

DE 19850223 A

Abstract (en)

Dishwasher and laundry detergent compositions contain narrow-range fatty acid alkyl ester alkoxylates. Detergent compositions contain fatty acid alkyl ester alkoxylates of formula (I): R<1>-COO(AO)m-R<2> (I) R<1> = 5-22C (preferably 7-17C) alkyl or alkenyl; R<2> = 1-6C alkyl, preferably Me or Et; AO = a 2-4C alkylene oxide unit; m = 1-20, preferably 5-12); provided that the alkoxylates include less than 14 wt.% of compounds containing (a-3) or fewer AO groups and less than 16 wt.% of compounds containing (a+3) or more AO groups, where a is the median number of AO groups.

Abstract (de)

Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel, die Fettsäurealkylesteralkoxylate der Formel R<1>- COO(AO)n - R<2> mit enger Homologenverteilung enthalten, wobei R<1> eine geradkettige oder verzweigte Alkyl- oder Alkenylgruppe mit 5 bis 22, vorzugsweise 8 bis 18 C-Atomen, R<2> C1-C6-Alkyl oder C2-C6-Alkenyl, vorzugsweise Methyl, AO eine C2-C4-Alkylenoxid-Einheit und n eine Zahl von 1 bis 20, vorzugsweise 3 bis 12, insbesondere 4 bis 10 bedeuten und diese Fettsäurealkylesteroxalkylate weniger als 14 Gew.-% an Verbindungen mit einem Gehalt von nicht mehr als (a - 3) -AO-Gruppen und weniger als 16 Gew.-% an Verbindungen mit einem Gehalt von nicht unter (a + 3) -AO-Gruppen, wobei a die Anzahl der -AO-Gruppen mit der maximalen Häufigkeit bezeichnet, enthalten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/74; C11D 1/83

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DX] EP 0335295 A2 19891004 - HOECHST AG [DE]
  • [DA] EP 0814152 A2 19971229 - HENKEL KGAA [DE]
  • [DA] DE 19509752 A1 19960919 - HENKEL KGAA [DE]
  • [DA] WO 9605284 A1 19960222 - HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al
  • [A] LITTAU C ET AL: "OPTIMIZATION OF SURFACTANT SYSTEMS CONTAINING METHYL ESTER ETHOXYLATES", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE,DE,VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, H. ZIOLKOWSKY K.G. AUGSBURG, vol. 124, no. 11, pages 690,692,694,69, XP000778430, ISSN: 0942-7694
  • [A] COX M F ET AL: "METHYL ESTER ETHOXYLATES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY,US,AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY. CHAMPAIGN, vol. 74, no. 7, pages 847-859, XP000659303, ISSN: 0003-021X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997521 A1 20000503; DE 19850223 A1 20000504; JP 2000136399 A 20000516; US 6395694 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030130

2001-02-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT FINANCE (BVI) LIMITED

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT GMBH

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT FINANCE (BVI) LIMITED

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI