Global Patent Index - EP 0997522 A1

EP 0997522 A1 2000-05-03 - Light duty liquid cleaning composition

Title (en)

Light duty liquid cleaning composition

Title (de)

Light duty liquid-Reinigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Composition liquide de nettoyage doux

Publication

EP 0997522 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120731 A

Priority

DE 19850222 A

Abstract (en)

Light-duty liquid detergent composition contains anionic surfactants (I) and fatty acid alkyl ester alkoxylates (II). Light-duty liquid detergent composition contains anionic surfactants (I) and fatty acid alkyl ester alkoxylates of formula R<1>-COO(AO)m-R<2> (II): R<1> = 5-22C (preferably 7-17C) alkyl or alkenyl; R<2> = 1-6C alkyl, preferably Me or Et; AO = a 2-4C alkylene oxide unit; m = 1-20, preferably 5-12.

Abstract (de)

Es werden light duty liquid Reinigungsmittel beansprucht, die anionische Tenside sowie Fettsäurealkylesteralkoxylate der Formel 1 R<1> - COO(AO)m - R<2> enthalten, worin R<1> eine verzweigte oder geradkettige Alkyl- oder Alkenylgruppe mit 5 bis 22, vorzugsweise 7 bis 17 Kohlenstoffatomen, R<2> eine geradkettige oder verzweigte Alkylkette mit 1 bis 6 C-Atomen, vorzugsweise 1 oder 2 C-Atomen, AO für eine C2-C4-Alkylenoxydeinheit und m eine Zahl von 1 bis 20, vorzugsweise 4 bis 12, insbesondere 5 bis 10 bedeutet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/74; C11D 1/83; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/08 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] DE 4227046 A1 19930218 - LION CORP [JP]
  • [DA] EP 0335295 A2 19891004 - HOECHST AG [DE]
  • [XA] "CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS", JP5202381, ISSN: 0009-2258, XP000408011
  • [A] COX M F ET AL: "METHYL ESTER ETHOXYLATES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY,US,AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY. CHAMPAIGN, vol. 74, no. 7, pages 847-859, XP000659303, ISSN: 0003-021X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997522 A1 20000503; DE 19850222 A1 20000504; JP 2000136400 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020718

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-02-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT FINANCE (BVI) LIMITED

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI