Global Patent Index - EP 0997523 A1

EP 0997523 A1 2000-05-03 - Aqueous solutions of phosphonic acids

Title (en)

Aqueous solutions of phosphonic acids

Title (de)

Wässrige Lösungen von Phosphonsäuren

Title (fr)

Solutions aqueuses d'acides phosphoniques

Publication

EP 0997523 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121341 A

Priority

DE 19849379 A

Abstract (en)

Aqueous solutions containing salts of amino-(methylene phosphonic acids) with at least 6 phosphonic acid groups, or mixtures of the corresponding free acids. Aqueous solutions containing salts of phosphonic acids of formula (I): n = 3, 4 and/or 5 with an active substance content (based on free phosphonic acid) of at least 25 wt. % , obtained by partial neutralization of at least one phosphonic acid group per molecule. An Independent claim is also included for aqueous solutions containing mixtures of free phosphonic acids of formula (I) or a similar formula (II) with the index n replaced by n'. n and n' = 1, 2, 3, 4 and/or 5 with an active substance content as above, comprising at least two acids of formula (II) with n not equal to n' and with an active substance content of at least 25 wt. % based on complex former content.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung sind wäßrige Lösungen von Phosphonsäuren und/oder deren Salzen sowie insbesondere deren Verwendung als Komplexbildner zur Behandlung von cellulosehaltigen Fasermaterialien, die in Entmineralisierungsprozessen und zur Stabilisierung von peroxidhaltigen Bleichlösungen eingesetzt werden können.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/36; C11D 3/39; D06L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/36 (2006.01); D06L 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/364 (2013.01); D06L 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997523 A1 20000503; EP 0997523 B1 20021204; AT 229065 T 20021215; DE 19849379 A1 20000504; ES 2188086 T3 20030616

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151026

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 229065

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20151026

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903638

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141204

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20041027

2005-10-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041027

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2188086

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903638

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI SE

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 229065

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FI SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI