Global Patent Index - EP 0997526 A1

EP 0997526 A1 2000-05-03 - Process of cleaning carpets with a composition comprising peroxygen bleach

Title (en)

Process of cleaning carpets with a composition comprising peroxygen bleach

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Teppichreinigung mit einer Persauerstoffbleichmittel enthaltenden Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Procédé de nettoyage de tapis avec une composition contenant un agent de blanchiment peroxydé

Publication

EP 0997526 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98870232 A

Priority

EP 98870232 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a process of cleaning a carpet with a liquid composition comprising a peroxygen bleach and an N-vinyl polymer, said process comprising the steps of applying said composition to the surface of the carpet and leaving said composition to dry onto the carpet. The carpet cleaning composition according to the present invention provides carpet cleaning and/or carpet anti-resoiling benefits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 11/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 1/10 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/16 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 7/22 (2006.01); C11D 7/54 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01); D06L 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3757 (2013.01); C11D 3/0031 (2013.01); C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/3773 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 11/0017 (2013.01); C11D 17/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997526 A1 20000503; AU 6281699 A 20000522; CA 2346734 A1 20000511; JP 2002528272 A 20020903; WO 0026333 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020205

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI