Global Patent Index - EP 0997545 A1

EP 0997545 A1 2000-05-03 - Ornamental aluminum alloy member and process for producing the same

Title (en)

Ornamental aluminum alloy member and process for producing the same

Title (de)

Dekoratives Element aus Aluminiumlegierung und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément décoratif en alliage d'aluminium et procédé de fabrication de celui-ci

Publication

EP 0997545 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121491 A

Priority

JP 31138398 A

Abstract (en)

An ornamental aluminum alloy member (10) has a substrate (1) made of an aluminum alloy, and an anodic oxidation film (2) formed on a surface of the substrate. The aluminum alloy forming the substrate (1) contains from 0.1% to 3% by weight of Zr, from 0.1% to 15% by weight of Mischmetal (Mm), from 0.1% to 5% by weight of Mg, optionally from 0.1% to 5% by weight of at least one metal element selected from the group consisting of Mo, W, Nb, Ag and Ta, and the balance of Al. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/00; C22F 1/04; C25D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/14 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/04 (2006.01); C25D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2013.01); C22C 1/0416 (2013.01); C22F 1/04 (2013.01); C25D 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0778158 A1 19970611 - BAYER AG [US]
  • [A] EP 0610006 A1 19940810 - TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] EP 0272528 A2 19880629 - ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 037 (C - 680) 24 January 1990 (1990-01-24)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 117 (C - 487) 13 April 1988 (1988-04-13)
  • [A] ED. BY J.R. DAVIS & ASSOCIATES: "Aluminum and Aluminum Alloys", 1993, ASM INTERNATIONAL, USA, XP002129984

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997545 A1 20000503; CN 1093884 C 20021106; CN 1254028 A 20000524; HK 1027601 A1 20030718; JP 2000144489 A 20000526

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030215

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991028

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI