Global patent index - EP 0997547 A1

EP 0997547 A1 2000-05-03 - Al-Mg-Si based aluminum alloy extrusion

Title (en)

Al-Mg-Si based aluminum alloy extrusion

Title (de)

Stranggepresste Al-Mg-Si Legierung auf Aluminium Basis

Title (fr)

Extrusion d'un alliage de Al-Mg-Si à base d'aluminium

Publication

EP 0997547 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120845 A

Priority

  • JP 30561698 A
  • JP 5636899 A

Abstract (en)

An Al-Mg-Si based aluminum alloy extrusion having large strength, absorbable impact energy and resistance against compressing cracking, wherein the average size of Mg2Si precipitation in the Ä1 0 0Ü and Ä0 1 0Ü directions of the (1 0 0) plane inside grains is 20 nm or more, the distribution density of the Mg2Si precipitation in the Ä0 0 1Ü direction of the (1 0 0) plane is 100 or more per mu m<2>, and the size of precipitations on grain boundaries is 1000 nm or less. Alternatively, in the Al-Mg-Si based aluminum alloy extrusion, a tensile strength obtained from a tensile test performed at a strain rate of 1000 per second is from 150 to 400 N/mm<2> (both inclusive).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/02; C22C 21/04; C22C 21/06; C22C 21/08; C22F 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); C22F 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/08 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22F 1/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0805219 A1 19971105 - ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]
  • [X] EP 0687743 A1 19951220 - FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 05 30 June 1995 (1995-06-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 04 31 May 1995 (1995-05-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 03 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997547 A1 20000503; US 2002014287 A1 20020207; US 2003041925 A1 20030306

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030114

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI