Global Patent Index - EP 0997555 A1

EP 0997555 A1 2000-05-03 - Process for producing a thin ceramic coating on a metallic substrate

Title (en)

Process for producing a thin ceramic coating on a metallic substrate

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen einer dünnen Beschichtung auf einem metallischen Substrat

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'un dépôt de céramique de faible épaisseur sur un substrat métallique

Publication

EP 0997555 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98203600 A

Priority

EP 98203600 A

Abstract (en)

Forming a ceramic deposit of a low thickness on a metallic substrate comprises: (a) forming a metallic electroplated coating on the substrate; the metal when oxidized forms a ceramic and is chosen from zirconium, titanium, aluminum, and magnesium; (b) oxidizing the metal to obtain a ceramic adhering to the substrate.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé de réalisation d'un dépôt de céramique de faible épaisseur sur un substrat métallique, est caractérisé en ce qu'il consiste : à effectuer un dépôt électrolytique d'un métal sur le substrat métallique, le métal étant choisi parmi le zirconium, le titane, l'aluminium, le magnésium, à oxyder le métal déposé pour obtenir une céramique adhérente au substrat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/48; F01D 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/48 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/48 (2013.01); F01D 5/284 (2013.01); F01D 5/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9408071 A1 19940414 - SIEMENS AG [DE], et al
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 7730, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M11, AN 77-53109Y, XP002096293
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9211, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M13, AN 92-084487, XP002096294

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997555 A1 20000503; EP 0997555 B1 20040225; DE 69821942 D1 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TECHSPACE AERO

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TECHSPACE AERO

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-08-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-05-26 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69821942

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI