Global Patent Index - EP 0997557 A2

EP 0997557 A2 2000-05-03 - Plating tank with outer tank made of steel and inner tank made of a chemically resistant plastic

Title (en)

Plating tank with outer tank made of steel and inner tank made of a chemically resistant plastic

Title (de)

Galvanikwanne mit einer Aussenwanne aus Stahl und einer Innenwanne aus chemisch resistentem Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Cuve de bain avec cuve de bain extérieure en acier et cuve de bain intérieure en plastique chimiquement résistant

Publication

EP 0997557 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120182 A

Priority

DE 19846886 A

Abstract (en)

Plating bath has an outer bath (1) made of steel and an inner liner (5) made of chemical resistant plastic. A profile is assigned to the inner liner and is connected to the wall edge of the outer bath so that it grips the profile end in the surrounding surge tank (8) in the form of a siphon. Preferred Features: The profile is formed in such a way that the whole wall edge of the outer bath is completely covered. The upper edge of the inner bath protrudes over the upper edge of the surge tank.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einer Galvanikwanne aus einer aus Stahl gefertigten Aussenwanne (1) und einer in ihr aus Kunststoff hergestellten sitzenden Innenwanne (5) ein spannungsfreies Ausdehnen bei Temperaturerhöhungen zu ermöglichen und trotzdem eine wasser- und gasdichte Abdichtung zwischen der Innen- (5) und der Aussenwanne (1) zu erzielen, ist am oberen Rand der Innenwanne (5) umlaufend ein ein Wasserschloss (8) bildender Kanal (15) angeordnet, in den ein Schenkel (12) eines auf dem Rand (3) der Aussenwanne (1) aufliegenden vorzugsweise U-förmigen Rahmens (10) ragt. Der Kanal 15 ist mit einer Flüssigkeit (9), vorzugsweise Wasser, gefüllt, in die der Schenkel (12) eintaucht, jedoch ohne auf dem Boden des Kanals (15) aufzuliegen. Der obere Rand des Kanals (15) liegt tiefer als der Rand der Innenwanne (5), damit aus dem Wasserschloss (8) überlaufendes Wasser (9) nicht in den Zwischenraum (6) zwischen der Innen-(5) und der Aussenwanne (1), sondern in die Innenwanne (5) läuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19846886 A1 20000420; EP 0997557 A2 20000503; EP 0997557 A3 20040526

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-09-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000919

2005-03-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI