Global Patent Index - EP 0997561 A1

EP 0997561 A1 2000-05-03 - Method and device for cleaning flyer wings

Title (en)

Method and device for cleaning flyer wings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Flyerflügeln

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour nettoyer des ailettes

Publication

EP 0997561 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120556 A

Priority

DE 19847818 A

Abstract (en)

Sliver ducts (3) inside flyers are cleaned by inserting a flexible hose (7) with a spray nozzle (8) from the top end. Cleaning fluid, e.g. water at over 50 degrees C, is injected under high pressure, e.g. 0.8 MPa, while the nozzle (8) is moved backwards and forwards (Z). The contaminated fluid is collected at the bottom end. A claim is also included for a movable cleaning trolley carrying the hose (7) and pump, heater, recirculating pump, filter and fluid tank.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Flyerflügeln. Das Innere eines Luntenführungsrohres (3) eines kopfgelagerten Flyerflügels (4) soll rundherum gereinigt werden. Dazu wird in das mehrfach gekrümmte Luntenführungsrohr (3) vom Flügelkopfende her ein flexibler Schlauch (7) mit an seinem freien Ende angeordneter Spritzdüse (8) eingeführt. Aus der Spritzdüse (8) wird die Flüssigkeit mit hohem Druck senkrecht auf die Innenwand des Luntenführungsrohres (3) aufgespritzt, währenddem die Spritzdüse (8) in dem Luntenführungsrohr (3)hin- und herbewegt wird, wobei die am Luntenführungsrohrende (23) austretende verunreinigte Flüssigkeit aufgefangen wird. Die Vorrichtung weist eine flexiblen Druckschlauch (7) auf, der an eine Flüssigkeitspumpe (16) angeschlossen ist und der an seinem freien Ende eine Spritzdüse (8) aufweist. Der Außendurchmesser der Spritzdüse (8) ist um ein vorbestimmtes Maß kleiner als der Innendurchmesser des Luntenführungsrohres, wobei quer, vorzugsweise senkrecht zur Spritzdüsenachse verlaufende, vorzugsweise diametral gegenüberliegende Spritzbohrungen (12) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 11/00; D01H 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/30 (2006.01); D01H 7/48 (2006.01); D01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/30 (2013.01); D01H 11/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19847818 C1 20000420; EP 0997561 A1 20000503; EP 0997561 B1 20040121; JP 2000136446 A 20000516; JP 3235998 B2 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATMED AG

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908357

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIRMA ERNST HOLZ

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI