Global Patent Index - EP 0997562 A2

EP 0997562 A2 2000-05-03 - Bonded woven fabric product and method for its manufacture

Title (en)

Bonded woven fabric product and method for its manufacture

Title (de)

Gebundenes Gewebe und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tissu lié ainsi que procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0997562 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307017 A

Priority

GB 9819288 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a bonded woven fabric product and a method for its manufacture. The product finds use as a tufting substrate for carpet manufacture. Existing problems in the field include deformation of fabric weave in fabric stretched in the fabric plane; deflection of flat rectangular polypropylene tapes giving stitch placement defects within a carpet; and reduced dimensional stability, strength and tuft lock in mechanically fibrillated tapes. The invention provides a woven product (Fid. 1, 5a) comprising a plurality of first threads (10a), and a plurality of second threads (15a), wherein contact portions (20a) provided along each first thread (10a) contact respective contact portions (25a) provided along each second thread (15a), wherein further each first thread (10a) is bonded to each second thread (15a) at the respective contact portions (20a, 25a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 9/00; D03D 15/00; D03D 19/00; D05C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 9/00 (2006.01); D03D 19/00 (2006.01); D03J 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/06 (2013.01); D03D 9/00 (2013.01); D03D 19/00 (2013.01); D10B 2401/041 (2013.01); D10B 2503/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997562 A2 20000503; EP 0997562 A3 20040407; GB 9819288 D0 19981028

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 03D 9/00 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 03D 15/00 B

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 03D 19/00 B

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 05C 17/02 B

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI