Global Patent Index - EP 0997570 A2

EP 0997570 A2 2000-05-03 - Method and device for computer assisted determination of clusters of parameters to detect foam formation in a washing machine and method and device to detect foam formation in a washing machine

Title (en)

Method and device for computer assisted determination of clusters of parameters to detect foam formation in a washing machine and method and device to detect foam formation in a washing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur rechnergestützten Ermittlung von Clustern zur Erkennung von Schaumbildung in einer Waschmaschine sowie Verfahren und Anordnung zur Erkennung von Schaumbildung in einer Waschmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la détermination assistée par ordinateur d'un cluster de paramètres pour détecter la formation de mousse dans une machine à laver et procédé et dispositif pour détecter la formation de mousse dans une machine à laver

Publication

EP 0997570 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118916 A

Priority

DE 19844949 A

Abstract (en)

The values measured include the pressure, the temperature and the water volume present in the machine. Training data vectors are formulated from the measured values and used to register clusters which indicate whether foam formation can be expected. The washing machine (101) associated with the process has a drum (102) and sensors (103,104,105) to measure pressure, temperature and water volume, respectively.

Abstract (de)

Während eines Waschvorgangs werden folgende Größen gemessen: ein in der Waschmaschine herrschender Druck, eine in der Waschmaschine herrschende Temperatur, und eine in der Waschmaschine vorhandene Wassermenge. Aus den gemessenen Größen werden Anwendungsvektoren gebildet und für die Anwendungsvektoren werden Fuzzy-Zugehörigkeitswerte zu vorgegebenen Clustern ermittelt. Abhängig von den Fuzzy-Zugehörigkeitswerten wird eine Schaumbildung erkannt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997570 A2 20000503; EP 0997570 A3 20020213; EP 0997570 B1 20060802; DE 59913725 D1 20060914; US 6269506 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-02-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-11-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913725 P 20060914

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030408

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI