Global Patent Index - EP 0997574 A1

EP 0997574 A1 2000-05-03 - Process and installation for barrier laundering and laundry sealed transfer device usable in such installation

Title (en)

Process and installation for barrier laundering and laundry sealed transfer device usable in such installation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage für Trennwandwaschen und verschlossene Transfertvorrichtung für eine solche Anlage

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de blanchissage barrière et dispositif de transfert étanche de linge utilisable dans une telle installation

Publication

EP 0997574 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402657 A

Priority

FR 9813580 A

Abstract (en)

The laundry has a dirty washing section (10) and a clean washing section (12) separated by a partition (14) with a bagging unit (19). The dirty washing is passed through the bagging unit so that it arrives in the clean section in sealed bags (24) which are designed to open and release the washing in the machine (26) before the wash cycle starts. Each bag can be opened by an element that dissolves in water or a closure that is opened by the mechanical action of the machine.

Abstract (fr)

Dans une blanchisserie barrière incluant une pièce (10) d'entrée du linge sale (16) et une pièce non contaminée (12) séparée de la pièce (10) par une cloison étanche (14), un dispositif (19) de transfert étanche du linge est prévu dans la cloison (14). Ce dispositif (19) permet d'introduire le linge sale (16), depuis la pièce d'entrée (10), dans des sacs étanches (24) situés dans la pièce non contaminée (12), sans rompre à aucun moment l'étanchéité de la cloison (14). Les sacs (24) remplis de linge et fermés sont acheminés dans un lave-linge (26) placé dans la pièce non contaminée. Ils sont conçus pour libérer le linge dès le début du cycle de lavage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 95/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997574 A1 20000503; EP 0997574 B1 20040102; AT 257188 T 20040115; CZ 298558 B6 20071107; CZ 9903791 A3 20000517; DE 69913922 D1 20040205; DE 69913922 T2 20041209; DK 0997574 T3 20040419; ES 2212498 T3 20040716; FR 2785301 A1 20000505; FR 2785301 B1 20010126; PT 997574 E 20040531; TR 9902702 A2 20000721; TR 9902702 A3 20000721; US 6357069 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161027

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-07-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170504

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 257188 T

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-06-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913922

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212498 T3

2004-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-04-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400770

2004-04-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-04-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913922 P 20040205

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001005

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI