Global Patent Index - EP 0997578 A1

EP 0997578 A1 2000-05-03 - Headbox

Title (en)

Headbox

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête

Publication

EP 0997578 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116257 A

Priority

  • DE 19927241 A
  • DE 29823639 U

Abstract (en)

The stock inlet for a papermaking machine has an outlet jet (56) across the machine width with at least one wall (4, 5) across the machine width across the pulp flow direction. A number of separate supports (14) are fitted to at least one of the walls (4), to vary the jet (56) opening dimensions in sections to alter the jet delivery forces. The resulting force line (K) of each support (14) is generally at right angles to the machine width and remains on the plane of the pulp flow direction. The adjustments are made on the pulp flow plane in the center section (1). Supports (14, 14') are fitted to two facing walls (4, 5). The center section (1) is divided into zones across the machine width, as a turbulence generator preferably with a number of pulp diffusers. The entry section (2) is divided into sections across the machine width. At least one jet wall (4, 5) swings on an axis (6) across the flow direction and/or slides in the pulp flow direction. The jet walls (4, 5) have a bending stiffness across the machine width, at the supports (14, 14'), of 5 X 109> Nmm2> to 7.5 X 1010> Nmm2> for each 100 mm of wall length in the flow direction. At least one wall (4, 5) is positioned in sections over several separate supports (14, 14'). The separate supports (14, 14') are linked to the center section (1) and the jet wall (4, 5). The supports (14, 14') have no lateral links between them which carry push, pull and/or bending forces. At least one support (14) at a swing wall (4) is in a static model structure with at least three rods, linked together at a point offset from the center section (1) and jet wall (4). At least one rod is near the entry section (2) and at least one further rod is near the wall swing axis (6), while the third rod is at the jet wall (4). The three rods of a support (14) are in or are symmetrical to a plane on the pulp flow line and at right angles to the machine width. The rod near the wall swing axis (6) grips the jet wall (4) directly or indirectly. At least one rod has a variable length, and their mounting points at the center section (1) and/or the jet swing wall (4) can be adjusted. A lifting mechanism (8) acts on all the supports (14) in the same manner, using a pneumatic or hydraulic cylinder and/or an air bellows, through the toggle joints at the rods and/or the effects of temperature. The rod lengths and/or their mounting points are variable in the same direction and amount for all the supports (14), to shift a jet wall (4, 5) in the same direction across the machine width. At least one rod has a variable length for a fine adjustment of the jet wall position, which is activated separately or together with other supports. The model is used to give a one-piece support (7, 10) on the center section (1) or the jet wall (4, 5) with a junction point for a rod. The jet walls (4, 15) are without stiffening ribs and profiles on the lateral direction. Grooves to compensate for tension are at the jet walls (4, 5) on the flow line from the outer flow side. A non-swing jet wall (5) is mounted to the stock inlet foundation by ribs or profiles. The supports (14, 14') at the jet walls (4, 5) are equidistant or they are at different intervals of 50-1000 mm and preferably 200-500 mm. The swing axis (6) of the swing jet wall (4) is close to the center section (1), and a swing axis (24a) is close to the end (15) of the jet. Two swing mountings are between a stock inlet side wall and a side support. The side supports are at the mounting and/or foundation of the stock inlet. At least one adjustable support (12) grips the center section (1) directly or indirectly, at a gap from the end (15) of the jet, so that the bending of the stock inlet structure is the same laterally between and/or outside the support points. The swing axis at the end (15) of the jet is defined by guides where the axis is mounted. At least one support (12) has at least two support units, at different gaps from the end (15) of the jet on the pulp flow direction, giving different lifts, so that the stock inlet swings close to its end (15). An entry plate (11) is at the entry side (2) to stiffen the center section (1) and/or as a mounting for additional function units. The plate is across the flow line, generally across the width of the center section (1), forming part of the entry section (2) over its height. At least one jet wall (5) is on a sliding support (10) to move along the flow direction, with at least one mechanical, hydraulic and/or pneumatic adjustment unit, to be moved over the support (10). The adjustment unit has at least two rotating bolts in the support (10), each with an eccentric extension to engage in a groove in the jet wall (5). The rotating bolts preferably have levers with integrated swing nuts, operated by a common spindle with opposed threadings. Each eccentric extension can be detached from its rotating bolt. The entry section (2) has separate feed drillings (18) to take the inflow of the fiber pulp suspension. The drillings (18) are connected either with longer hoses (3) or directly to a common distribution pipe, parallel to the outflow gap at the jet end.

Abstract (de)

Ein Stoffauflauf für eine Papiermaschine umfaßt eine sich quer zur Maschinenlaufrichtung L über die Maschinenbreite erstreckenden Düse 12, die eine untere und eine obere, sich jeweils über die Maschinenbreite erstreckende durchgehende Wand 14 bzw. 16 aufweist. Die untere Düsenwand 14 ist über mehrere über die Maschinenbreite verteilte getrennte Stützelemente 42 auf einem Fundament 44 abgestützt. Die Stützelemente 42 sind quer zur Maschinenlaufrichtung L nachgiebig oder biegeweich. Alternativ oder zusätzlich ist die verschwenkbare obere Düsenwand 16 über mehrere über die Maschinenbreite verteilte getrennte Tragelemente 50 mit einem oberhalb der Schwenkachse A angeordneten Querträger 52 verbunden. Die Tragelemente 50 sind quer zur Maschinenlaufrichtung L wieder nachgiebig oder biegeweich ausgebildet. Alternativ oder zusätzlich sind ein oberer Arm 24 und ein in Maschinenlaufrichtung L hinteres Zentralteil 28 einer zentralen Baugruppe 22 des Stoffauflaufs 10 quer zur Maschinenlaufrichtung L jeweils segmentiert, während ein einlaufseitiges Zentralteil 26 der zentralen Baugruppe 22 und die untere Düsenwand 14 quer zur Maschinenlaufrichtung L jeweils durchlaufend ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/024 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997578 A1 20000503; EP 0997578 B1 20040428; AT 265571 T 20040515

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130819

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-07-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909314 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOTZ, WOLF GUNTER

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MERATH, THOMAS

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEHLEITER, KLAUS

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINK, CHRISTOPH

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FREY, JOSEF

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRAEGELOH, ECKART

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIETZ, THOMAS

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUHAS, SIMON

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI