Global Patent Index - EP 0997582 A1

EP 0997582 A1 2000-05-03 - Road barriers with integrated coupling means

Title (en)

Road barriers with integrated coupling means

Title (de)

Leitplanken mit integrierten Verbindungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Barrières de securité à liason intégrée

Publication

EP 0997582 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99430027 A

Priority

FR 9813716 A

Abstract (en)

The road barrier (1) has a first end with an integral male connector (21) with has a projection (22). The second end of the barrier comprises an integral female connection. The female connection has a first opening portion (41) through which the male projection can extend. There is a second opening for the long male connector. A stop near the second portion prevents passage of the projection.

Abstract (fr)

Le domaine technique de l'invention est celui de la fabrication d'éléments séparateurs réalisés en tôle d'acier pliée, destinés à l'édification et la pose temporaire de barrières de sécurité mobiles ou déplaçables sur le sol. La présente invention a pour objet des éléments de barrières permettant la réalisation de barrières provisoires qui servent notamment à séparer une voie de circulation d'une autre voie de circulation. Selon l'invention, un élément (1) séparateur de barrière déplaçable apte à être posé ou fixé sur le sol, de forme allongée selon un axe longitudinal (1b) horizontal, est caractérisé en ce que : une première extrémité de l'élément de barrière comporte au moins un organe intégré de liaison mâle comportant une structure allongée (21) qui est prolongée par une partie saillante (22) ; une deuxième extrémité de l'élément de barrière comporte au moins un organe intégré de liaison femelle qui est complémentaire à l'organe mâle intégré. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/088 (2013.01); E01F 15/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997582 A1 20000503; DE 19950777 A1 20000504; FR 2788287 A1 20000713; FR 2788287 B1 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030702

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI