Global Patent Index - EP 0997588 A1

EP 0997588 A1 2000-05-03 - Roofing tile of the beaver-tail type

Title (en)

Roofing tile of the beaver-tail type

Title (de)

Biberschwanz-Falzziegel

Title (fr)

Tuile de toiture du type queue de castor

Publication

EP 0997588 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121079 A

Priority

DE 29819252 U

Abstract (en)

The tile has head, side and foot sections where the latter has an inner and an outer ridge which can be covered by a groove located between the inner and outer ridges of the head section of another tile. The inner ridge of the foot projects a distance x further into the groove than the outer ridge.

Abstract (de)

Der Biberschwanz-Falzziegel verfügt über eine Kopf-, Seiten- und Fußverfalzung. Letztere weist eine innere (427) und eine äußere (423) Fußfalzrippe auf, die bei Eindeckung in eine zwischen einer äußeren (213) und inneren (217) Kopffalzrippe angeordneten Kopffalznut (216) hineinragt, während die äußere Fußfalzrippe (423) der äußeren Kopffalzrippe (213) vorgelagert ist. Diese Körperstruktur soll beibehalten werden. Weiterhin gilt es, die im Biberschwanz-Ziegel bei der Verlegung auf dem Dach sicherer miteinander zu verankern und die Dichtheit der Eindeckung zu verbessern. Zu diesem Zweck ragt die innere Fußfalzrippe (427) bei Eindekkung im einen Betrag X weiter nach unten, als die äußere Fußfalzrippe (423). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819252 U1 20000302; AT 306596 T 20051015; DE 59912649 D1 20051117; EP 0997588 A1 20000503; EP 0997588 B1 20051012

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081021

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912649 P 20051117

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2005-10-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031017

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI