Global Patent Index - EP 0997589 A2

EP 0997589 A2 2000-05-03 - Roof ridge or edge ventilating element

Title (en)

Roof ridge or edge ventilating element

Title (de)

First- oder Gratbelüftungselement

Title (fr)

Elément d'aération de faîte ou arête de toit

Publication

EP 0997589 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120863 A

Priority

DE 29819431 U

Abstract (en)

The ventilation unit (1) is for roof ridges and rafters. It has an air-permeable centre-section (2) with edge zones (2a,b) to be secured to the roof structure (9a,b). Each edge zone of the centre section is securely stitched to metal foil strips (3a,b) acting as side sections. The centre section is made of woven polyester fibres with a tensile strength of 210 N/cm and a stretch to fracture of about 70%. The sewing thread (4b) is made of cotton, synthetic fibre, an industrial twisted thread or a crepe yarn.

Abstract (de)

Ein First- oder Gratbelüftungselement (1) weist einen zur Befestigung auf einer First- (5) oder Gratlatte vorgesehenen, luftdurchlässigen Mittelteil (2) aus einem Gewebe auf, dessen Randbereiche (2a, 2b) beidseitig mit Seitenteilen zur Fixierung an einer Dacheindeckung (9a, 9b) verbunden sind. Jeweils ein Randbereich (2a, 2b) des Mittelteils (2) ist mit einem ein Seitenteil ausbildenden Metallfolienstreifen (3a,3b) fest vernäht. Es wurde ein First- oder Gratbelüftungselement (1) entwickelt, dessen Mittelteil (2) eine witterungsbeständige und kostengünstig herstellbare Verbindung mit den beiden Seitenteilen aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/17; E04D 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/176 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819431 U1 19990114; AT 257886 T 20040115; DK 0997589 T3 20040216; EP 0997589 A2 20000503; EP 0997589 A3 20001102; EP 0997589 B1 20040114; ES 2217667 T3 20041101; PT 997589 E 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-10-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090616

2009-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-17 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2009-03-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-01-14 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-01-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-01-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20080527

2008-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WEROFORM PROFILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHMID BAUKUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WEROFORM PROFILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041014

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCHMID BAUKUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Effective date: 20041014

2005-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WEROFORM PROFILE GMBH & CO. KG

2005-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHMID BAUKUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WEROFORM PROFILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-12-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHMID BAUKUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217667 T3

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-04-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908296 P 20040219

2004-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010428

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010428

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 13/17 A, 7E 04D 3/40 B, 7E 04D 1/36 B

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI