Global Patent Index - EP 0997590 A3

EP 0997590 A3 2000-09-06 - Connecting means for wall coverings or the like

Title (en)

Connecting means for wall coverings or the like

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für Wandverkleidungen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour revêtements muraux ou similaires

Publication

EP 0997590 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117972 A

Priority

DE 29819167 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997590A2] The system consists of vertical and horizontal metal battens. It has holders (1) and mainly U-shaped guide parts (3) with bases (3a) fastened to the holders. The legs (3b, c) of the guide part project mainly vertically from its base. The distance between the legs corresponds mainly to the outer cross section of a horizontal fitting batten. Each guide part leg has an aperture (6a, b) for fasteners. The face of the holder away from the legs is fastened to a spring or spring batten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0801 (2013.01); E04F 13/0814 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819167 U1 19990610; EP 0997590 A2 20000503; EP 0997590 A3 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI