Global Patent Index - EP 0997592 A1

EP 0997592 A1 2000-05-03 - Removable cover strip

Title (en)

Removable cover strip

Title (de)

Abnehmbare Abdeckleiste

Title (fr)

Couvre-joint demontable

Publication

EP 0997592 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410148 A

Priority

FR 9813883 A

Abstract (en)

The building joint cover comprises a covering section (10) to engage a base profile (12) to be fixed on a support (18). The cover joint includes several intermediate resilient clamps (16) to be engaged in the covering section. The base profile has a tongue (12a) with a rounded end engaging a hook section (16a) of the intermediate clamp. Claims include an independent claim for the cover fixing

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un couvre-joint du type comportant un profilé de recouvrement (10) prévu pour s'enclencher sur un profilé socle (12) à fixer sur un support (18, 30). Le couvre-joint comprend plusieurs pièces intermédiaires élastiques (16) destinées à recevoir par enclenchement le profilé de recouvrement et à s'enclencher de manière réversible le long du profilé socle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/062 (2013.01); E04F 19/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997592 A1 20000503; FR 2785316 A1 20000505; FR 2785316 B1 20010119

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030811

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DURAL GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GROSJEAN, MICHEL

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI