Global Patent Index - EP 0997596 A2

EP 0997596 A2 2000-05-03 - Fitting for attachment of fence panels to fence posts

Title (en)

Fitting for attachment of fence panels to fence posts

Title (de)

Befestigungsbeschlag für Zaunelemente an Zaunpfosten

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour fixation de panneaux de clôture et des poteaux de clôture

Publication

EP 0997596 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120844 A

Priority

DE 19849400 A

Abstract (en)

The fixing system has two parts, the first has a rigid projection of saw-toothed notches made in it that is attached to the fence panel. Some projections are shorter while others are longer., which enables the panels to be inserted between pre-erected posts. The second part is flat and is attached to the fence post. It has a recess which receives the first part, the notches engaging with it a tongue extending across the recess.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich dabei um einen zweistückigen Beschlag. Beschlagsteile 1 weisen starre Auskragungen auf. Beschlagsteile 2 sind flach und weisen eine Aussparung auf. Diese werden über die gebohrten Löcher an die Zaunpfosten montiert. Durch Einschwenken kommt das Zaunelement zwischen die Pfosten und rastet in den Befestigungsbeschlag ein. In diesem Zustand ist die Verbindung Pfosten/Zaunelement jederzeit und ohne Werkzeug leicht zu demontieren. Bei Dauerzaunanlagen sperrt ein abdeckender Sicherungssplint die Demontierbarkeit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/16 (2006.01); E04H 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/20 (2013.01); E04H 17/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997596 A2 20000503; EP 0997596 A3 20010207; DE 19849400 A1 20000511; DE 19849400 C2 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI