Global Patent Index - EP 0997596 A3

EP 0997596 A3 2001-02-07 - Fitting for attachment of fence panels to fence posts

Title (en)

Fitting for attachment of fence panels to fence posts

Title (de)

Befestigungsbeschlag für Zaunelemente an Zaunpfosten

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour fixation de panneaux de clôture et des poteaux de clôture

Publication

EP 0997596 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120844 A

Priority

DE 19849400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997596A2] The fixing system has two parts, the first has a rigid projection of saw-toothed notches made in it that is attached to the fence panel. Some projections are shorter while others are longer., which enables the panels to be inserted between pre-erected posts. The second part is flat and is attached to the fence post. It has a recess which receives the first part, the notches engaging with it a tongue extending across the recess.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/16 (2006.01); E04H 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/20 (2013.01); E04H 17/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997596 A2 20000503; EP 0997596 A3 20010207; DE 19849400 A1 20000511; DE 19849400 C2 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI