Global Patent Index - EP 0997598 A1

EP 0997598 A1 2000-05-03 - Screw guide apparatus for espagnolette or espagnolette lock

Title (en)

Screw guide apparatus for espagnolette or espagnolette lock

Title (de)

Schraubenführungsvorrichtung für Treibstange oder Treibstangenschloss

Title (fr)

Dispositif de type guide-vis pour cremone ou cremone-serrure

Publication

EP 0997598 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98440238 A

Priority

EP 98440238 A

Abstract (en)

The screw guide is connected to the back of a door lock bolt head to ensure sliding connection of an operating rod (3) with the head. It has a drilled guide pin communicating with an opening in the head for the passage of a fixing screw. The guide screw comprises fastening tabs (27) which engage with the side walls (7,8) of the rabbet enclasping groove (4) to hold the bolt in the longitudinal and transverse position.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a trait à un dispositif de type guide-vis prévu apte à être rapporté à l'arrière d'une têtière (2) de crémone ou crémone-serrure tout en assurant une liaison coulissante d'une tringle de manoeuvre (3) à ladite têtière (2), ce dispositif (1) comportant au moins un plot de guidage (12, 12A) perforé communiquant avec une ouverture (13, 13A) dans la têtière (2) pour le passage d'une vis de fixation destinée à rendre solidaire cette dernière d'une menuiserie de type porte, fenêtre ou analogue, comportant, en feuillure de châssis ouvrant ou encore de cadre dormant, une rainure d' encastrement de ladite crémone ou crémone-serrure. Avantageusement, ce dispositif de type guide-vis (1) comporte des moyens d'accrochage (26) prévus aptes à coopérer avec les parois latérales (7, 8) de la rainure d'encastrement (4) en vue d'assurer le maintien en position longitudinale et transversale de la crémone ou crémone-serrure dans ladite rainure (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/22 (2013.01); E05C 9/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997598 A1 20000503; EP 0997598 B1 20041006; DE 69826866 D1 20041111; DE 69826866 T2 20051020; ES 2229464 T3 20050416

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69826866

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071029

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071029

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061027

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061027

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229464 T3

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826866 P 20041111

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI