Global Patent Index - EP 0997600 A1

EP 0997600 A1 2000-05-03 - Glass carrier device of a vehicle door window regulator with a cursor being moulded on an arm of a glass clamping support

Title (en)

Glass carrier device of a vehicle door window regulator with a cursor being moulded on an arm of a glass clamping support

Title (de)

Scheibenmitnehmer für Kraftfahrzeugtür mit einer an einem Arm einer Scheibenbefestigungsklammer angespritzten Mitnehmerführung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support d'une vitre sur un lève-vitre de porte de véhicule avec curseur surmoulé sur une patte d'une pince support de vitre

Publication

EP 0997600 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402665 A

Priority

FR 9813528 A

Abstract (en)

The support for a window (2) on a vehicle door window winder comprises a clamp with two glazing clamping jaws (8). These fit under the lower edge of the pane. A tab (9) extends laterally from a jaw and a cursor (6) slides on a winder guide rail (1). The plastics cursor is moulded onto the tab. The moulding enables the removal of play between the cursor and tab.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de support d'une vitre (2) sur un lève-vitre de porte de véhicule, comportant une pince (17) à deux mâchoires (8) de serrage de la vitre, adaptées pour s'emboîter sous le bord inférieur (2a) de celle-ci, une patte (9) prolongeant latéralement une mâchoire (8) sensiblement dans le plan de celle-ci, un curseur (6) profilé pour pouvoir coulisser sur un rail (1) de guidage du lève-vitre, et des moyens pour solidariser le curseur et la patte, caractérisé en ce que le curseur (6) étant en matière plastique, est surmoulé sur la patte (9). Ce surmoulage permet la suppression totale du jeu entre le curseur (6) et la patte (9) de support de la pince (7), dans la direction transversale ainsi que dans la direction longitudinale, et réduit l'encombrement de l'ensemble du dispositif par rapport à la technique antérieure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/488 (2013.01); E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997600 A1 20000503; FR 2785326 A1 20000505; FR 2785326 B1 20010126

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050702

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041220

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS-FRANCE

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI