Global Patent Index - EP 0997601 A2

EP 0997601 A2 2000-05-03 - Cladding elements

Title (en)

Cladding elements

Title (de)

Verkleidungselemente

Title (fr)

Eléments d'habillage

Publication

EP 0997601 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890335 A

Priority

AT 181598 A

Abstract (en)

The cladding element has a profiled wall parallel with the plane of the window when incorporated, and has arms (5,6) extending from the profiled wall towards the jamb(1) and or casement/leaf. At least one open chamber (25) is formed by the profiled wall and arms. Ridges (5a,6a) molded on the arms protrude into the chamber and divided the chamber into a mounting holder duct (4) and a further duct (26).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft Verkleidungselemente zur Verkleidung von Stock oder Flügel von Fenstern oder Türen, mit einer in eingebautem Zustand zur Fensterebene im wesentlichen parallelen Profilwand und mit Stegen (5,6), die sich von der Profilwand zum Stock-bzw. Flügel erstrecken, wobei durch die Profilwand und die Stege (5, 6) mindestens eine offene Kammer ausgebildet ist, wobei erfindungsgemäß an den Stegen (5, 6) in die Kammer ragende Rippen (5a, 6a) angeformt sind, die die Kammer in einen Montagehalterkanal (4) und einen weiteren Kanal (26) unterteilen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E06B 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/62 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/68 (2013.01); E06B 1/62 (2013.01); E06B 3/302 (2013.01); E06B 3/362 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0517057 A2 19921209 - NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997601 A2 20000503; EP 0997601 A3 20010725; AT 406785 B 20000925; AT A181598 A 19991115

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020126

2002-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI