Global Patent Index - EP 0997606 A1

EP 0997606 A1 2000-05-03 - Cord drive or similar for a roller shutter

Title (en)

Cord drive or similar for a roller shutter

Title (de)

Seilantriebsvorrichtung oder dergleichen für einen Rolladen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entrainement à cordon ou analogue pour volet roulant.

Publication

EP 0997606 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440282 A

Priority

FR 9813474 A

Abstract (en)

The window shutter drive comprises a pulley (3) around which the cord is wound. The pulley rotates integrally with a drive shaft driving the shutter winding shaft through a reduction gear. A torque limiter (9,10) ensures declutching of the drive by the pulley beyond a specified resisting torque produced by the winding shaft. The torque limiter consists of an intermediate hub (8) rotating with the driving shaft. The pulley is mounted on this hub which is provided with driving blades (9) driving complementary sections (10) connected to the hub. These resilient blades are able to fold under the effect of a specified resistance to driving to allow free rotation of the pulley relative to the intermediate hub.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif d'entraînement à cordon ou analogue pour volet roulant comprenant une poulie (3) autour de laquelle vient s'enrouler ledit cordon (2), cette poulie (3) étant montée solidaire en rotation sur un arbre d'entraînement (4) en prise avec l'arbre d'enroulement (5) du tablier du volet roulant, notamment par l'intermédiaire d'un mécanisme réducteur (6), un mécanisme limiteur de couple (7) étant prévu apte à assurer le débrayage de l'entraînement par la poulie (3) au-delà d'un couple résistant déterminé produit par l'arbre d'enroulement (5), ce mécanisme (7) consiste en un moyeu intermédiaire (8) solidaire en rotation de l'arbre d'entraînement (4) sur ce moyeu (8) étant monté, de manière tournoyante, la poulie (3), laquelle est pourvue de moyens d'entraînement (9) en prise avec des moyens complémentaires (10) associés audit moyeu (8) ces moyens d'entraînement (9) et les moyens d'entraînement complémentaires (10) étant prévus de nature élastique et de manière apte à se plier sous l'effet d'une résistance à l'entraînement déterminé, pour autoriser la libre rotation de la poulie (3) par rapport au moyeu intermédiaire (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/78; E06B 9/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/78 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01); E06B 9/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/78 (2013.01); E06B 9/80 (2013.01); E06B 9/88 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997606 A1 20000503; EP 0997606 B1 20030521; DE 69908064 D1 20030626; DE 69908064 T2 20040401; ES 2195531 T3 20031201; FR 2785015 A1 20000428; FR 2785015 B1 20010216

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041023

2005-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051022

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041023

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-11-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031014

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908064 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI