Global Patent Index - EP 0997608 A3

EP 0997608 A3 2001-12-12 - A device to optimize the yield of oil wells

Title (en)

A device to optimize the yield of oil wells

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Optimierung der Ergiebigkeit von Erdölquellen

Title (fr)

Un dispositif pour optimiser le rendement de puits de pétrole

Publication

EP 0997608 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99500161 A

Priority

AR 9805214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997608A2] A device which optimizes the yield of oil wells characterized by a piston stroke sensor (1) capable of measuring the parameters of the pump piston, a dynamometer (2) which shows performance and power used by the pump, a flowmeter sensor (3), a sensor which controls the operation parameters of the performance of the power engine (4), a degree of acidity gauge (5) of the extracted fluid, a degree of viscosity gauge (6), a salinity monitoring assembly of the extracted oil, a pressure and level fluid between columns sensor and a gas detector, all of them connected to the well monitoring assembly which processes the received data and which is connected to the monitoring base (D). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/12; E21B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/12 (2006.01); E21B 47/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/0008 (2013.01); E21B 43/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997608 A2 20000503; EP 0997608 A3 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 43/12 A, 7E 21B 47/00 B

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI