Global Patent Index - EP 0997610 A1

EP 0997610 A1 2000-05-03 - Ejectable holder for a cutting bit and cutting bit assembly

Title (en)

Ejectable holder for a cutting bit and cutting bit assembly

Title (de)

Abwerfbarer Halter für einen Schneidmeissel und Schneidmeisselanlage

Title (fr)

Porte-outil éjectable pour un trépan et ensemble de trépan de forage

Publication

EP 0997610 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119903 A

Priority

US 18130598 A

Abstract (en)

A cutting bit holder for use in conjunction with a base having a central bore defined by a bore wall. The cutting bit holder comprises an axially forward end and an axially rearward end. The holder contains a bit bore adjacent to the axially forward end thereof wherein the bit bore receives the cutting bit. The holder has a shank adjacent to the axially rearward end thereof wherein the central bore of the base receives the shank. A volume is defined between the shank and the bore wall. The shank presents a pressure surface that defines in part the volume. The volume communicates with a source of pressurized fluid so that upon entry of the pressurized fluid into the volume the fluid acts on the pressure surface so as to urge the holder axially forward in the central bore of the base. The shank and the bore together form a key and keyway so that the key engages the keyway so as to correctly position the holder relative to the base and to prevent the holder from rotating relative to the base. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 35/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/19 (2006.01); E21C 35/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/19 (2013.01); E21C 2035/1826 (2013.01); E21C 2035/191 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

WO 9945238 A1 19990910 - MINNOVATION LTD [GB], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997610 A1 20000503; DE 997610 T1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-10-05 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2000-08-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-07-07 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI