Global Patent Index - EP 0997635 A2

EP 0997635 A2 2000-05-03 - Method for testing a throttle point, especially a throttle point of an injector

Title (en)

Method for testing a throttle point, especially a throttle point of an injector

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Prüfen einer Drosselstelle, insbesondere einer Drossestelle eines Injektors

Title (fr)

Procédé d'essai d'un point d'étranglement, notamment un point d'étranglement d'un injecteur

Publication

EP 0997635 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121321 A

Priority

DE 19850221 A

Abstract (en)

Volume flow of the hydraulic pressure medium within restrictor is measured and first and second operating points are determined, the latter due to a change in outlet pressure. The first point determines a definite characteristic curve with reliable and unreliable operating points. The second operating point is placed on the characteristic curve and a positive or negative test result determined.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Prüfen einer Drosselstelle, insbesondere der Drosselstelle eines Injektors vorgeschlagen. Diese wird von einer Pumpe mit einem ersten konstanten Druckniveau (p1) primärseitig beaufschlagt wobei der von der Pumpe gelieferte Volumenstrom Q des hydraulischen Druckmediums erfaßt wird. Es wird ein erster und weitere Betriebspunkte bestimmt. Die weiteren Betriebspunkte werden über die Veränderung eines zweiten, vorgebbaren sekundärseitigen Druckniveau (p2) ermittelt. Der erste Betriebspunkt bestimmt maßgeblich ein Kennlinienfeld (KF), welches ein Bereich zulässiger und nicht zulässiger Betriebspunkte aufweist. Anhand der Position der weiteren Betriebspunkte im Kennlinienfeld (KF) wird ein positives bzw. negatives Prüfergebnis detektiert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997635 A2 20000503; EP 0997635 A3 20020410; DE 19850221 C1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070424

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI