Global Patent Index - EP 0997636 A1

EP 0997636 A1 2000-05-03 - Combustion engine, power tool and start device

Title (en)

Combustion engine, power tool and start device

Title (de)

Verbrennungsmotor, Motorwerkzeug und Anlasssystem

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne, outil motorisé et dispositif de démarrage

Publication

EP 0997636 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121014 A

Priority

US 17899498 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has an ignitor unit(22) designed so that it can supply an ignition voltage sufficient to operate the spark plug(18) at an engine RPM of about 500 revolutions per minute with an ignition delay of about 8 degrees, and the operating slot in the starter disc has a diameter of about 6.35 to 8.64 centimetres. The ignitor unit may activate the spark plug at an engine speed of 7000 revolutions per minute with ignition delay. An Independent claim is included for a tool powered by the proposed engine and which may be a thread cutter, motorized scythe, hedge clippers or chain saw. An Independent claim is included for a starting system incorporating an ignitor which operates a spark plug at an engine speed of about 500rpm.

Abstract (de)

Verbrennungsmotoren mit einem handbetätigten Zuganlasser sind allgemein bekannt. Diese Art von Verbrennungsmotoren weisen eine Anlasserscheibe und ein Betätigungsmittel auf, das in einer Betätigungsmittelkerbe um die Anlasserscheibe geschlungen ist. Es wird ein Verbrennungsmotor (10) mit einer vergrößerten Anlasserscheibe (24) vorgeschlagen, durch die ein leichteres Anlassen des Verbrennungsmotors (10) ermöglicht wird. Verbrennungsmotoren, Motorwerkzeuge und Anlaßsysteme werden beispielsweise in der Garten-, Rasen- und Grundstückspflege eingesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01); F02N 3/02 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 3/02 (2013.01); F02B 63/02 (2013.01); F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5816221 A 19981006 - KRUEGER WILLIAM R [US]
  • [DA] US 5600195 A 19970204 - WELBORN LYNN C [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 047 (E - 099) 26 March 1982 (1982-03-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 003, no. 080 (M - 065) 11 July 1979 (1979-07-11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997636 A1 20000503; EP 0997636 B1 20050112; AU 4752399 A 20000511; AU 769046 B2 20040115; CA 2279615 A1 20000426; CA 2279615 C 20050208; DE 59911435 D1 20050217; US 6314938 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111022

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911435

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-05-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911435 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHTRONIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI